Gerst v. Arpaio

Plaintiff: Joshua James Gerst
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Case Number: 2:2012cv01353
Filed: June 25, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's December 26, 2012 Motion to Withdraw First Amended Complaint (Doc. 14 ) is granted. This case is dismissed without prejudice and the Clerk of Court must close the case and enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/13/2013.(KMG)
October 19, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Joshua James Gerst. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/18/12. (DMT)
August 6, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Joshua James Gerst. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/6/2012. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gerst v. Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua James Gerst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?