Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated v. Bashas' Incorporated

Plaintiff: Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated
Defendant: Bashas' Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv01497
Filed: July 12, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Bashas' Incorporated and against Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated, in the amount of $81,866.81. All remaining claims are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 04/12/16. (GAR)
March 23, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion for extension of time to file memoranda. Bashas' motion for extension is granted, but only for an additional 15 days, through and including 4/7/ 2016. No further extensions shall be granted. See order for additional details. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 3/23/2016.(LMR)
September 13, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Bashas' 23 Motion for Attorney Fees and awarding Bashas fees and costs in the amount of $81,866.81. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/12/2013.(LFIG)
June 17, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Kubicek's 22 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/17/2013.(LFIG)
May 8, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Bashas' 14 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk shall enter final judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/7/2013.(LFIG)
October 23, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 2 Motion to Withdraw the Reference as to the remaining claims asserted against Bashas. Because the remaining claims were originally presented in the action before Judge Campbell, Robert Kubicek Architects & Assoc . Inc. v. Bosley, No. 11-CV-2112-DGC (Oct. 27, 2011 D. Ariz.), we encourage the parties to file a motion asking Judge Campbell to transfer this action to him and consolidate these remaining claims with 11-CV-2112-DCG. See LRCiv 42.1. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/23/2012.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated v. Bashas' Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Chicoine
Represented By: Darrell Lamar Hawkins
Represented By: Philip R Rupprecht
Represented By: Richard K Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bashas' Incorporated
Represented By: Andrew Abraham
Represented By: Ralph D Harris
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Represented By: Cassandra Blythe Meynard
Represented By: Isaac Daniel Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?