Womack v. GEO Group Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: John Donald Womack
Defendant: John Gay, Unknown McWilliams, Charles L Ryan and GEO Group Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv01524
Filed: July 16, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 73 Motion Not to Allow Change of Attorney for Defendant GEO is DENIED. Defendant's 74 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's 73 Motion is DENIED as moot. ORDERED that counsel and any unrepresented party must comply with the Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Arizona, as amended on December 1, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/18/2013.(LFIG)
October 16, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 66 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying as moot 67 Motion to Compel; denying 70 Motion for Extension of Dispositive Motion Deadline (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/15/13.(TLJ)
June 3, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Expert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/3/13.(TLJ)
February 8, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 15 Motion to Proceed on a Supplemental Complaint Adding New Defendant and Request for Leave to Amend the First Amended Complaint, is DENIED. The denial of leave to amend the First Amended Complaint as to Defendan t GEO Group is without prejudice. Plaintiff may move to file a Second Amended Complaint as indicated in this order. Thereafter, the Court will screen the proposed amended complaint as required by 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(a). Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default 20 , and Motion for Contempt and Application for the Court to Enter Default Judgment and Request for the Court to Order an Inquest be Taken Before a Jury to Assist Plaintiff's Damages, 23 , are DENIED. D efendant GEO Group's 26 Motion for Leave to File to Amend Answer to Specifically Deny Count I, is GRANTED. Defendant must file and serve its lodged Amended Answer, as required by LRCiv 15.1(a), on or before February 19, 2013. That the Novemb er 15, 2012 Order, which incorrectly states "[t]he Court granted Plaintiff in forma pauperis status," doc. 14 at 1, is hereby corrected nunc pro tunc that the Court denied Plaintiff in forma pauperis status. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/8/13.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Womack v. GEO Group Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Donald Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?