McGill et al v. National Specialty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Robert McGill and Lorraine McGill
Defendant: National Specialty Insurance Company, KnightBrook Insurance Company, Knight Management Insurance Services LLC, PeakStone Financial Services Incorporated, Payless Car Rental System Incorporated, PCR Venture of Phoenix LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv01671
Filed: August 6, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2015 414 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Payless entities' motion to alter or amend the judgment (Doc. 384 ) is granted. The Knight entities' motion for attorneys' fees (Doc. 380 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The Knight entities are awarded fees of $41,145. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. See document for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 07/01/15. (ATD)
April 17, 2015 376 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Knight entities' claims for negligence, negligent misrepresentation, and breach of fiduciary duty are barred by the statute of limitations; the Payless entities have failed to prove their claim of insurance bad faith against the Knigh t entities; the Knight entities are entitled to indemnification from the Payless entities in the amount of $970,000; the Knight entities are also entitled to recover their reasonable attorneys' fees and expenses incurred in defending agains t the second lawsuit filed by the McGills; on or before 5/1/15, the Knight entities shall file a memorandum setting forth the expenses and fees reasonably incurred in defending against that lawsuit; the Payless entities shall file a response on or before 5/15/15; the Knight entities shall file a reply on or before 5/22/15; the Clerk shall enter judgment consistent with this Order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/17/15. (REW)
October 27, 2014 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 264 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/27/2014.(DGC, nvo)
October 7, 2014 266 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part 264 Motion for Reconsideration. Defendants shall file a response to the motion for reconsideration as stated in the order on or before 10/14/2014. No reply shall be permitted unless ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/7/2014.(DGC, nvo)
September 3, 2014 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 193 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 227 Motion ; denying 232 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 242 Motion in Limine; denying 253 Motion for Leave to File; denying 256 Motion. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/3/2014.(DGC, nvo)
December 11, 2013 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 150 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/11/2013.(DGC, nvo)
November 22, 2013 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 127 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/22/2013.(DGC, nvo)
January 29, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting 51 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Dismiss; denying 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 15 Motion for Rule 56(d) relief. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/29/2013.(NVO)
December 18, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Requests to dismiss Mr. Fisher on the basis of fraudulent joinder are denied. Defendants shall file a single, joint response to the motion to remand on or before 1/4/2013; Plaintiffs shall file a reply on or before 1/11/2013. The Court will decide the motion to remand before addressing the pending motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/18/2012. (NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGill et al v. National Specialty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McGill
Represented By: Scott Ian Palumbo
Represented By: Brett Lawrence Slavicek
Represented By: Elliot G Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine McGill
Represented By: Scott Ian Palumbo
Represented By: Brett Lawrence Slavicek
Represented By: Elliot G Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Alison Rebecca Christian
Represented By: Douglas L Christian
Represented By: Stephen M Dichter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KnightBrook Insurance Company
Represented By: Alison Rebecca Christian
Represented By: Douglas L Christian
Represented By: Stephen M Dichter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Management Insurance Services LLC
Represented By: Alison Rebecca Christian
Represented By: Douglas L Christian
Represented By: Stephen M Dichter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PeakStone Financial Services Incorporated
Represented By: Shayna Helene Balch
Represented By: Pavneet Singh Uppal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payless Car Rental System Incorporated
Represented By: Arron Burt Nesbitt
Represented By: Kyle Paul Seedorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCR Venture of Phoenix LLC
Represented By: Arron Burt Nesbitt
Represented By: Kyle Paul Seedorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?