PCT International Incorporated v. Holland Electronics LLC

Plaintiff: PCT International Incorporated
Defendant: Holland Electronics LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv01797
Filed: August 21, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2016 460 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 447 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Review of Judgment on Taxation of Costs. The Clerk of Court shall enter $524.10 in taxable costs to Plaintiff and against Defendant. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/8/16.(LSP)
March 30, 2016 457 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 449 PCTs motion for $32,561.94 in supplemental damages. The Clerk of Court shall issue judgment in this amount in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant. (This is a supplemental judgment and does not amend or in any way impact the original judgment). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 03-30-16.(GAR)
September 8, 2015 433 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED AS FOLLOWS: As found by the jury and the Court in this case, Plaintiff PCT International Incorporated prevailed on its infringement claim against Defendant Holland Electronics LLC. Accordingl y, for the reasons set forth in the Court's contemporaneously filed Order: Judgment is entered in favor of PCT International Incorporated and against Holland Electronics LLC in the amount of $576,027.53. Permanent Injunction - See Judgment for Details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/8/15. (MAP)
July 21, 2015 430 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that Defendant's Application for Attorneys' Fees Re: Sanctions Awarded in Conjunction with Defendant's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Trial Subpoenas (Doc. 356 ) is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED awarding Holland Electronics, LLC $6,463.50 in attorneys' fees. (See document for details.) Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 07/21/2015. (ATD)
March 2, 2015 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 222 Motion for Sanctions is denied. Defendant's 223 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's 260 Motion for Leave to File Non-Electronic Exhibit is d enied. ORDERED the Clerk of the Court shall return to PCT the non-electronic exhibit known as "Exhibit 26." Plaintiff's 229 Motion to Exclude is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's 233 Motion to Exclude is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's 237 Motion to Exclude is denied without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/2/2015.(LFIG)
November 18, 2014 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting/denying in part 216 PCT's Renewed Motion to Under Seal Certain Documents FURTHER ORDERED See Order for Complete List of Documents Allowed to be Filed Under Seal. FURTHER ORDERED granting /denying in part 214 Holland's R evised Motion to File Under Seal. FURTHER ORDERED that Holland may file under seal as needed the following documents that Holland has lodged under seal as exhibits to the Shaw Declaration (Doc. 214-1): (1) Exhibit 1; (2) Exhibit 2; (3) Exhibit 3; (4 ) Exhibit 5; (5) Exhibit 6; (6) Exhibit 9; and (7) Exhibit 10. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties may, on or before 12/1/14, file the following motions: (1) PCT's motion to exclude the expert opinion of David A. Haas; (2) PCT's motion to exclude the expert opinion of Daniel J. Whittle; and (3) Holland's motion for summary judgment (alternatively, for partial summary judgment and to preclude any theory of indirect infringement for lack of disclosure). Any responses are due 12/8/14. Any replies are due 12/15/14. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/18/14.(MAP)
September 23, 2014 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the 156 , 183 , 192 , 165 , 195 , 170 , 160 , 164 , 200 and 209 Motions to Seal. ORDERED striking Docs. 158 , 184 , 185 , 193 , 168 , 196 , 171 , 161 , 162 , 166 , 201 , 202 , 191 and 210 . These documen ts shall remain under seal. ORDERED denying without prejudice and striking the 157 , 169 and 175 Motions. ORDERED striking Docs. 159 , 167 , 172 , 173 , 174 , 176 , 187 , 188 , 189 , 190 , 194 , 197 , 203 , 204 , 207 , [20 8] and 211 . ORDERED denying the 163 , 186 Stipulations and the 182 , 206 Notices but the documents to which these documents refer shall remain under seal as indicated above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the Court's procedure as set forth in this Order concerning the filing of motions to file under seal. The parties shall file their respective motions to file under seal within fourteen days from the date of this Order, with any responses due within the time period prescribed by Local Rule 7.2(c). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/23/2014.(LFIG)
June 4, 2014 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting PCT's Motion to File Under Seal its Reply in Support of Motion to Modify the Protective Order (Doc. 151 ). The Clerk of the Court shall file under seal PCT's Reply in Support of Motion to Modify the Protect ive Order, currently lodged as Doc. 153 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED striking Non-Parties eGtran Corporation and EZconn Corporation's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff PCT International, Inc.'sMotion to Modify the Protective Order for Confidential Information (Doc. 143 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying PCT's Motion to Modify the Protective Order for Confidential Information (Doc. 138 ). (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/3/14. (LAD)
April 30, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that PCT's 137 Motion to File Under Seal is denied without prejudice (Doc. 139 to remain sealed). ORDERED that the November 7, 2013 hearing transcript is unsealed except for lines 7-15 on page 46 (Doc. 135 is to remain sealed). ORDERED that Holland shall within five days file a redacted copy of the November 7, 2013 hearing transcript that redacts only lines 7-15 on page 46. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that PCT's Motion to Modify the Protective Order for Confidential Info rmation lodged at Doc. 139 is stricken but remains sealed. PCT may within five days refile its Motion if it believes that either a new redacted or sealed version is necessary for the Court's ruling. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/30/2014.(LFIG)
March 19, 2014 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 125 Motion to Unseal Hearing. ORDERED that, for the limited purpose of obtaining a complete copy of the November 7, 2013 hearing transcript for Plaintiff's outside counsel, the hearing transcript is unsealed only for transcription by the court reporter. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/19/2014. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
February 21, 2014 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the claims are construed under Markman v. Westview Instruments, Inc., 517 U.S. 370 (1996) as specified in this Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/21/2014. (LFIG)
March 7, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Disqualify Counsel is denied. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/7/2013.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PCT International Incorporated v. Holland Electronics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PCT International Incorporated
Represented By: Keith Beauchamp
Represented By: Scott Michael Bennett
Represented By: Miles A Finn
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Christopher K Larus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland Electronics LLC
Represented By: Paul D Chancellor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?