Pratt v. Office of Civil Rights et al

Plaintiff: Eddie L Pratt
Defendant: Gateway Community College, Office of Civil Rights and Colorado Department of Education
Case Number: 2:2012cv01821
Filed: August 29, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's pending motion 66 is denied without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction); alternatively, the motion is denied on the merits because it does not provide a basis for relief from judgment; in forma pauperis status is revoked because the appeal in this case is frivolous re: 14-15982 (see Doc. 69 ). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/27/14.(REW)
April 23, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Office of Civil Rights's (OCR) Motion to Dismiss 51 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 4 is granted, and Plaintiff's Amended Complaint against OCR is dismissed without prejudice; Plaintiff's Amended Complaint against Col orado Department of Education is dismissed without prejudice; Gateway's Notice of Lodging Form of Judgment 58 , requesting the Court to enter a separate judgment on the attorneys' fees Order 57 is denied; Plaintiff's other pending m otions 60 , 62 are denied; consistent with this Order and the Court's prior Order 41 the Clerk shall close this case and enter judgment in favor of Defendants OCR, Colorado Department of Education, and Gateway accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/23/14. (REW)
December 17, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration 42 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Gateway's motion for attorney's fees 43 in the amount of $1,054.00 is granted; Gateway is awarded $1,054.00 against Plaint iff. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that by January 13, 2014, Plaintiff shall file a memorandum showing cause why Defendant Colorado Department of Education should not be dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction (the Office of Civil Rights motion to dismiss remains pending). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/17/2013. (ALS)
June 13, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the motion to dismiss of Defendant Gateway 12 is granted; Defendant Gateway is dismissed, with prejudice, because the Complaint fails to state a claim against this Defendant; the Clerk shall not enter judgment at this time; on 7/10/13 at 2:3 0 p.m. Plaintiff shall appear and show cause why the two remaining Defendants (Office of Civil Rights and Colorado Department of Education) should not be dismissed for failing to serve; if Plaintiff fails to appear, or fails to show cause, judgment w ill be entered dismissing the Complaint against All Defendants; Gateway's motion for sanctions 29 is granted to the extent specified in this order; Gateway may file a motion for attorneys fees by 7/9/13; all other pending motions 13 , 15 , 16 , 21 , 22 , 23 , 25 , 31 , 34 , 36 are denied. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/12/13. (REW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratt v. Office of Civil Rights et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Civil Rights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie L Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?