Navarro v. Ryan

Petitioner: Robert Raymond Navarro
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 2:2012cv01899
Filed: September 7, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 22, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining the 72 R&R and this matter is remanded back to Magistrate Judge Metcalf for a determination as set forth. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/22/2016. (ATD)
April 12, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Magistrate Judge Anderson's R&R 17 is accepted with the minor modifications described above. Respondent's Motion to Stay 9 is granted and Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is hereby stayed and held in a beyance. Petitioner shall file a detailed status report no later than 30 days after the date of this Order. This order is not an order that is immediately appealable to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals (please see attached order for complete information). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/12/13. (TLJ)
October 16, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Petition (Doc. 1) and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by certified mail pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. Respondents must answe r the Petition within 40 days of the date of service. Petitioner may file a reply within 30 days from the date of service of the answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/16/12. (DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarro v. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Raymond Navarro
Represented By: Andrew Stroud Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?