Rhodes v. Chavez et al
Plaintiff: David Thomas Rhodes
Defendant: Ricardo E Chavez, J Hoffman, Robert E McFadden, Harrell Watts, J R Johnson, Unknown Party and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv01971
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On or before May 19, 2017, Plaintiff shall file a memorandum with the Court showing cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute explaining why he has not communicated with defense counsel regarding the status and scheduling of this case and why he did not appear at today's hearing. Plaintiff is warned that the Court will dismiss this case if he fails to respond as required by this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/17. (KGM)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 57 Plaintiff's motion to amend. The complaint included with his motion (Doc. 57 at 3-19) is deemed the operative complaint in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part 54 Defendants' Motion f or Summary Judgment; granted with respect to Defendants Chavez, Watts, and Johnson, and on Plaintiff's official capacity claim, and denied with respect to Defendant Hoffman. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 65 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. This case will proceed under the existing case management order (Doc. 52 ) against Defendant Hoffman. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/9/16.(LSP)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER, the motion to dismiss 19 is granted; Defendants' motion for summary judgment 35 is found to be moot; the Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/25/13.(REW)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file documents Exhibit A and B cited in Doc. 28 by October 14, 2013. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/30/2013. (TCA)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying Plantiff's 22 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/24/13.(REW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes v. Chavez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Thomas Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo E Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E McFadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrell Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J R Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?