Brown v. Reese et al

Plaintiff: Charles L Brown, III
Defendant: Clarence H Carter, Clyde L Reese, III, Melissa Waddell, Linda Register and Nina M Ware
Case Number: 2:2012cv02003
Filed: September 20, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 63 ) is granted. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for relief from order (Doc. 74 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/4/2013.(KMG)
July 24, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Motions of dismissed Defendants Linda Register, Melissa Waddell, and Clyde L. Reese III (Docs. 44 , 45 ) are denied as moot. Defendants Arizona Department of Economic Security and Clarence H. Carter's motion to dismiss (Doc. 46 ) is gra nted. Claims against Defendants Arizona Department of Economic Security and Clarence H. Carter under 42 U.S.C. §§ 1983, 1985, or any state laws are dismissed with prejudice. Leave to amend is granted with respect to claims against Defendan ts Arizona Department of Economic Security and Clarence H. Carter under Title VI of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 (42 U.S.C. § 2000d). Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before August 16, 2013. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/24/2013.(KMG)
February 11, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The motions to dismiss (Docs. 8 , 9 , 13 ) are granted. Leave to amend is not granted with respect to Defendants Georgia Department of Human Services, Clyde L. Reese III, Melissa Waddell, and Linda Register, but is granted with respect to Defendants Arizona Department of Economic Security and Clarence H. Carter. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by March 1, 2013. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2013.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Reese et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence H Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde L Reese, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Waddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Register
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina M Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles L Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?