Clerisy Corporation et al v. AirWare Holdings Incorporated, et al

Plaintiff: Clerisy Corporation and Reed Transition Technologies LLC
Defendant: Airware Holdings Incorporated and Crown Dynamics Corporation
Counter_claimant: Crown Dynamics Corporation and Airware Holdings Incorporated
Counter_defendant: Clerisy Corporation and Reed Transition Technologies LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv02110
Filed: October 5, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2013 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting Plaintiffs' motion to dismiss 109 ; this case is dismissed without prejudice; denying Defendants' cross-motion for attorneys' fees 110 ; denying as moot Defendants' motion to compel responses 95 , Plaintiffs' motion to compel 97 , Plaintiff's motion for a protective order 107 , and Plaintiffs' motion to file a surreply 117 ; the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/3/13.(REW)
July 24, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Court construes the disputed claim terms and enters the claim construction Order as set forth in this document (see order for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/23/13.(REW)
October 4, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendants' motion to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona is granted. The motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is denied as moot and the motion to dismiss for lack of standing is left to be determined by the District of Arizona. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on October 4, 2012. (MES) [Transferred from nywd on 10/5/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clerisy Corporation et al v. AirWare Holdings Incorporated, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Crown Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Michelle E Dawson
Represented By: Donald W OBrien, Jr
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Represented By: Nathan J Witzany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Airware Holdings Incorporated
Represented By: Michelle E Dawson
Represented By: Donald W OBrien, Jr
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Represented By: Nathan J Witzany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Clerisy Corporation
Represented By: Blaine T Bettinger
Represented By: Edward P Hourihan, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Represented By: Jeremy P Oczek
Represented By: Frederick JM Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Reed Transition Technologies LLC
Represented By: Blaine T Bettinger
Represented By: Edward P Hourihan, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Represented By: Jeremy P Oczek
Represented By: Frederick JM Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clerisy Corporation
Represented By: Frederick JM Price
Represented By: Jeremy P Oczek
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Represented By: Edward P Hourihan, Jr
Represented By: Blaine T Bettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reed Transition Technologies LLC
Represented By: Edward P Hourihan, Jr
Represented By: Blaine T Bettinger
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Represented By: Jeremy P Oczek
Represented By: Frederick JM Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airware Holdings Incorporated
Represented By: Michelle E Dawson
Represented By: Donald W OBrien, Jr
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Represented By: Nathan J Witzany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: Michelle E Dawson
Represented By: Donald W OBrien, Jr
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Represented By: Nathan J Witzany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?