AF Holdings LLC v. Harris

Plaintiff: AF Holdings LLC
Defendant: David Harris
Case Number: 2:2012cv02144
Filed: October 9, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that because of the previous settlements with joint tortfeasors involved in the same infringing swarm, Plaintiff would not be entitled to the maximum amount of statutory damages of $30,000.There is a risk, however, that Plaintiff will no t disclose that potential outcome to the alleged infringers when engaging in settlement negotiations with them after obtaining the requested discovery. It is in light of these concerns that the Court was not favorable to Plaintiff's request to issue subpoenas. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/20/13. (LSP)
June 11, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Show Cause Hearing for 6/21/2013 at 02:00 PM before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/11/13. (TLJ)
February 1, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Defendant's Motion for Security; denying 26 Defendant's Motion to Strike ; denying 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying 30 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/1/13.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AF Holdings LLC v. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AF Holdings LLC
Represented By: Steven James Goodhue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?