Collins v. Wells Fargo Bank et al

Plaintiff: John Collins
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, W Peter Ragan, Jr., Todd Gurstel, Bradley M Soos and Robert Kent
Case Number: 2:2012cv02284
Filed: October 25, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Gila
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Dismiss; granting 42 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Velocity Investments, LLC and Gurstel Chargo, P.A. are dismissed with prejudice from this action. The Clerk is kindly directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants, against Plaintiff, and terminate this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 7/22/13.(TLJ)
March 15, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Wells Fargo's Motion to Dismiss, doc. 14 , is GRANTED. Defendant Wells Fargo is dismissed with prejudice from this action. The Clerk is kindly directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Wells Fargo against Plaintiff without Rule 54(b) language. See AGA Shareholders, LLC v. CSK Auto, Inc., 2009 WL 297704 (D. Ariz. Feb. 6, 2009). (See document for full details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/15/13. (LAD)
November 16, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that before this matter can proceed to service of process, Plaintiff must amend the Complaint. That if Plaintiff seeks to file an Amended Complaint, he shall do so by December 7, 2012. That the failure to timely comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/16/12. (see order for full details)(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Wells Fargo Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Peter Ragan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Gurstel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley M Soos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?