Smith v. Chandler, City of et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Smith
Defendant: Chandler, City of, Blake Fairclough, Keith Smith, Abel Aragon and B Hawkins
Case Number: 2:2012cv02391
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE plaintiff Brandon Smith's negligence claim against the defendant City of Chandler. All the claims of all the parties having been resolved, the Clerk is directed to enter a final judgment. (See document for further details) Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 1/28/2020. (WLP)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER: It is therefore ORDERED GRANTING in part Defendants' Motion for Payment of Transcripts (Doc. 203 ). Plaintiff shall pay for the transcripts identified above and any additional transcripts cited in Defendant's answering brief in the court of appeals [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 12/18/17. (MAW)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial is DENIED (Doc. 189 ). Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Costs is GRANTED IN PART, in the amount of $95,258.00 in attorneys' fees and $17,975.00 in non-taxable costs (Doc. 188 ) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/9/17.(MAW)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re: 74 USCA Mandate. A review of the docket shows that at the time summary judgment was granted 55 , all deadlines had passed except for the proposed pretrial order, the final pretrial conference and the firm trial date. Discovery had close d in December 2013. Accordingly, all that is left in this case is the trial. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/25/2016. Jury Trial set for 11/14/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Fre derick J Martone. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Frederick J Martone. See attached order. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 9/20/2016. (LMR)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 71 Motion Requiring Cost Bond on Appeal. Plaintiff shall submit a check in the amount of $250.00 to the Clerk of the Court within seven (7) days of this order. See order for additional details. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/27/2015.(LMR)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 59 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Costs and awarding defendants $125,466.50 in fees and $34,891.75 in non-taxable costs. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/25/2014.(LMR)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting defendants' 35 Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDERED denying defendants' 50 Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/16/2014.(LFIG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Chandler, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Smith
Represented By: David Joseph Catanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandler, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Fairclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abel Aragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?