Arizona Dream Act Coalition et al v. Brewer et al

Plaintiff: Alejandra Lopez, Ariel Martinez, Natalia Perez-Gallegos, Arizona Dream Act Coalition, Jesus Castro-Martinez and Christian Jacobo
Defendant: Janice K Brewer, John S Halikowski and Stacey K Stanton
Case Number: 2:2012cv02546
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2015 306 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION: Plaintiffs' 251 Motion for Summary Judgment and a Permanent Injunction is granted. Defendants' 247 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Defendants and their officials, agents, and e mployees, and all persons acting in concert or participating with them, are permanently enjoined from enforcing any policy or practice by which the Arizona Department of Transportation refuses to accept Employment Authorization Documents, issued under DACA, as proof that the document holders are authorized under federal law to be present in the United States for purposes of obtaining a driver's license or state identification card. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/22/2015. (LFIG)
January 15, 2014 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 210 Motion to Compel re privilege documents. See order for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/15/2014.(DGC, nvo)
September 12, 2013 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 155 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs shall file their first amended complaint with the Clerk of Court on or before 9/18/2013. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/12/2013.(DGC, nvo)
June 27, 2013 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pursuant to the parties' stipulation 128 , the Clerk is directed to file under seal Docs. 83 , 85 , 90 , 96 , 97 , 102 , 103 , and 105 . The redacted documents submitted by the parties with their stipulation shall remain in the public docket. FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot ( 102 lodged, 140 filed) Plaintiffs' Motion in light of the parties' stipulation concerning documents to be filed under seal. FURTHER ORDERED The Clerk is directed to file under seal Doc. 99 . FURTHER ORDERED The Clerk is directed to unseal and file Doc. 86 . FURTHER ORDERED granting 118 Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to seal Docs. 121 and 126 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/27/13. (MAP)
June 6, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 117 Motion for Reconsideration FURTHER ORDERED granting 118 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/6/13.(MAP)
May 16, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The paties shall meet and resolve the sealing/redacting of materials related to named Plaintiffs' driving histories, and provide the Court notice of any agreement within 14 days of the issuance of this order. (See order for more details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/16/2013. (NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona Dream Act Coalition et al v. Brewer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandra Lopez
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Andrew S Jacob
Represented By: Thomas K Irvine
Represented By: Marty Harper
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Kelly Joyce Flood
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Rodkangyil Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Nora A Preciado
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Represented By: Victor Viramontes
Represented By: Cecillia D Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Martinez
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Rodkangyil Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Kelly Joyce Flood
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Marty Harper
Represented By: Thomas K Irvine
Represented By: Andrew S Jacob
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Nora A Preciado
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Represented By: Victor Viramontes
Represented By: Cecillia D Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Perez-Gallegos
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Rodkangyil Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Kelly Joyce Flood
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Marty Harper
Represented By: Thomas K Irvine
Represented By: Andrew S Jacob
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Nora A Preciado
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Represented By: Victor Viramontes
Represented By: Cecillia D Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Dream Act Coalition
Represented By: Cecillia D Wang
Represented By: Victor Viramontes
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Nora A Preciado
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Andrew S Jacob
Represented By: Thomas K Irvine
Represented By: Marty Harper
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Kelly Joyce Flood
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Rodkangyil Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Castro-Martinez
Represented By: Cecillia D Wang
Represented By: Victor Viramontes
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Nora A Preciado
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Andrew S Jacob
Represented By: Thomas K Irvine
Represented By: Marty Harper
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Kelly Joyce Flood
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Rodkangyil Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Jacobo
Represented By: Cecillia D Wang
Represented By: Victor Viramontes
Represented By: Karen Cassandra Tumlin
Represented By: Michael King Thomas Tan
Represented By: Nora A Preciado
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jennifer Chang Newell
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Linton Joaquin
Represented By: Andrew S Jacob
Represented By: Thomas K Irvine
Represented By: Marty Harper
Represented By: Lee Gelernt
Represented By: Kelly Joyce Flood
Represented By: Nicholas David Espiritu
Represented By: Rodkangyil Orion Danjuma
Represented By: Shiu-Ming Cheer
Represented By: Tanya Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice K Brewer
Represented By: Joseph Sciarrotta, Jr.
Represented By: Doug C Northup
Represented By: Sean Thomas Hood
Represented By: Timothy J Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S Halikowski
Represented By: Doug C Northup
Represented By: Sean Thomas Hood
Represented By: Timothy J Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey K Stanton
Represented By: Doug C Northup
Represented By: Sean Thomas Hood
Represented By: Timothy J Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?