McCormack et al v. Safeway Stores Incorporated

Plaintiff: Mary McCormack and Samantha Stabenchek
Defendant: Safeway Stores Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv02547
Filed: November 29, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 59 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/12/2014.(LFIG)
November 4, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 Motion for security for costs. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/4/2013.(DGC, nvo)
November 28, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 6 Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of Arizona (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormack et al v. Safeway Stores Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Stores Incorporated
Represented By: William F Murphy
Represented By: J Cross Creason, III
Represented By: Mark Ogden
Represented By: Peter Christopher Prynkiewicz
Represented By: Brooke Sikora Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary McCormack
Represented By: Joy Malby Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Stabenchek
Represented By: Joy Malby Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?