Isom v. JDA Software Incorporated

Plaintiff: Kimberly Isom
Defendant: JDA Software Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv02649
Filed: December 12, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2016 175 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff is awarded liquidated damages in the amount of $114,618 pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 2617(a)(1)(A)(iii), bringing the total damages award for Plaintiff and against Defenda nt to $229,236. Plaintiff is entitled to $872.46 in prejudgment interest on the lost wages award, and $872.46 in prejudgment interest on the liquidated damages award, for a total of $1,744.92. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant in the amount of $230,980.92, with post-judgment interest to accrue at the applicable federal rate.. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 03-31-16. (GAR)
September 17, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 116 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification of Court's June 29, 2015 Order. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/17/2015.(TLB)
June 29, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, granting the Motion to Strike Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Supplemental Statement of Facts and Attached Exhibits (Doc. 105 ). Doc. 104 and Doc. 104-1 shall be stricken. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 90 ). See document for details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 06/29/15. (ATD)
October 24, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit re: Response to Summary Judgment Motion (Doc. 94 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file into the record Plaintiff's Response in Oppo sition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, currently lodged at Doc. 95 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal (Doc. 97 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a new motion to seal within seven days of the date of this Order. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/24/14. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isom v. JDA Software Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Isom
Represented By: Daniel Lee Bonnett
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Kroll
Represented By: Susan Joan Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JDA Software Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?