Stallings v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: Brian K Stallings
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Incorporated, Unknown Martin, Thomas A Bell and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 2:2013cv00067
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Presiding Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 71 Plaintiff Stallings' Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice and denying as moot 53 Defendants Ryan and Martin's Motion for Summary Judgment and 69 Defendants Bell and Wexford's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. The Clerk must enter judgment of dismissal and terminate this action. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/8/14.(LSP)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date this Order is filed to file any response to Defendants' 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 3/27/2014. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Brian Stallings. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/19/2013. (LFIG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallings v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Health Sources Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?