Eldridge #147718 v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Gerald Lee Eldridge
Defendant: Unknown Willams, Stacey Crabtree and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 2:2013cv00888
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2014 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as it relates to discovery in this case 135 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED referring the Motion to Compel (Doc. 135 ) to Pro Se Staff Attorneys for consideration as a request by Plaintiff for injunctive relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 12/23/14. (LSP)
May 8, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's objections (Docs. 82 , 83 ) are denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/8/14. (LSP)
February 4, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 9 Eldridge's Motion for Protective Order and denying 46 Eldridge's Motion seeking preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/3/14.(LSP)
August 15, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee. The retaliation claim in Count Three is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Ryan, Crabtree, and Williams must answer t he Complaint. The Clerk send Plaintiff this Order, and a copy of the Marshals Process Receipt & Return form (USM-285) and Notice of Lawsuit & Request for Waiver of Service of Summons form for Defendants Ryan, Crabtree, and Williams. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. Defendants must file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Custody (Doc. 9 ) within 20 days of the date of service of the Complaint. Plaintiff may file a reply within 10 days of Defendants' Response. Plaintiff's Motion to Release (Doc. 7 ) is denied as premature. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. 8 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff's Application for Deferral (Doc. 10 ) is denied as moot. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/15/13. (Attachments: # 1 Letter, # 2 Service Packet 1, # 3 Service Packet 2, # 4 Service Packet 3). (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eldridge #147718 v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gerald Lee Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Willams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?