Gazian et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al

Plaintiff: Ken Gazian, Pierre Investments Incorporated and Aragadz Foods Incorporated
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA, Hubert Kelly and Kelly & Kelly PC
Case Number: 2:2013cv01312
Filed: July 2, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2015 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 213 Motion to Continue; granting 213 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying 213 Motion for Sanctions. Telephonic hearing 6/5/2015 at 4:00 PM. Status conference set foro 9/4/2015 at 3:30 PM. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/29/2015.(DGC, nvo)
February 12, 2015 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 204 Motion to Strike; granting 145 Fifth MOTION in Limine re: Exclude Ken Gazian's Testimony Concerning Alleged Lost Profits. Summary judgment is granted on Plaintiffs' claim for lost profits from the Park Plaz a Tower transaction. The parties shall prepare for a second final pretrial conference to be held on 3/20/2015 at 3:00 PM before The Honorable David G. Campbell, 401 W. Washington Street, Courtroom 603, Phoenix, Arizona. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/12/2015.(DGC, nvo)
September 18, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 108 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 118 Motion for oral argument. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/18/2014.(DGC, nvo)
May 29, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion to Strike; granting 77 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint on or before 6/4/2014. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/29/2014.(DGC, nvo)
February 18, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 60 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/18/2014.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gazian et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Gazian
Represented By: Darrell G Adkerson
Represented By: Jeffrey Antonson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Investments Incorporated
Represented By: Darrell G Adkerson
Represented By: Jeffrey Antonson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aragadz Foods Incorporated
Represented By: Darrell G Adkerson
Represented By: Jeffrey Antonson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Erica Julie Stutman
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Willis(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubert Kelly
Represented By: James K Kloss(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Adam S Polson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly & Kelly PC
Represented By: James K Kloss(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Adam S Polson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?