Sojka v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Alan Marcel Sojka, II
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2013cv01449
Filed: July 16, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: David K Duncan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett's 39 R&R is accepted. Sojka's 1 petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 02/12/2016. (ATD)
October 5, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 39 : The petition for writ of habeas corpus (Doc. 1 ) is denied and dismissed with prejudice. A certificate of appealability and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal are denied. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/5/15. (EJA)
September 13, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 2 ) is granted. Petitioner's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. 8 ) and "Motion to Access Lexis-Law or Westlaw" (Doc. 9 ) are denied. The Clerk of Court must ser ve a copy of the Petition (Doc. 1 ), the Motion"To Stay and Abey Habeas Proceedings Until State Remedies are Exhausted" (Doc. 4 ), and this Order on the Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Arizona by certified mail pursua nt to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. This matter, including the Motion to Stay and Abey, is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/13/13. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sojka v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Linley Sarah Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Represented By: Linley Sarah Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alan Marcel Sojka, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?