Gardner et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jay N Gardner and Rachel B Gardner
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC, T.D. Service Company of Arizona and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2013cv01641
Filed: August 12, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2017 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiffs' remaining claims against the AMSL Legal Group, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Defendants' motion for summary judgment 106 is granted. Plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The parties' stipulation 107 for amendments to the court's scheduling order is moot and is therefore rejected. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 6/27/17. (SLQ)
December 7, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motions to dismiss ( 87 and 89 ) are granted in part and denied in part. Count Six as to T.D. Service Company of Arizona, Japp, and Goff is dismissed. Count Seven as to Nationstar Mortgage, T.D. Service Company of Arizona, Japp, and Goff is dismissed. Count Six and Seven are dismissed with prejudice as plaintiffs have had multiple opportunities to plead the claims asserted in these counts. The motions to dismiss are denied as to all other counts and contentions. The court urg es the parties to seriously consider engaging a private mediator or requesting the designation of a United States magistrate judge to assist them with a settlement conference. (See Order for complete details.) Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 12/07/2015. (ATD)
August 7, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Motion to Strike. See document for further details. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 08/07/2015.(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay N Gardner
Represented By: Marc Allain Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel B Gardner
Represented By: Marc Allain Adair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Stacey Faith Gottlieb
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.D. Service Company of Arizona
Represented By: Stacey Faith Gottlieb
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Sixkiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?