Newton v. Phoenix, City of et al

Plaintiff: Hearman Lee Newton
Defendant: Phoenix, City of and Michael Myers
Case Number: 2:2013cv01874
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 8 and Plaintiff's Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision 21 ; Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 8 is denied without prejudice; and The Magistrate Judge's Decision 19 denying appointment of counsel is affirmed. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/3/2014. (ALS)
June 13, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Judge Aspey's R&R 18 is rejected. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint 12 is granted. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by July 11, 2014. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/13/2014. (ALS)
June 10, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 20 and the Motion is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/10/2014.(ALS)
January 15, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet): Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 2 is granted. Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $17.04. Counts Two and Three are dismissed withou t prejudice. Defendant City of Phoenix is dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Myers must answer Count One. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint 1 , this Order, and both summons and request for waiver f orms for Defendant Myers. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on Defenda nt within 120 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/15/2014. (See attached PDF for complete information)(ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton v. Phoenix, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hearman Lee Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?