National Trust for Historic Preservation et al v. Suazo et al

Plaintiff: National Trust for Historic Preservation, Wilderness Society and Archaeology Southwest
Defendant: Raymond Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management and United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 2:2013cv01973
Filed: September 27, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and INJUNCTION: By September 30, 2017, BLM shall complete its reconsideration of the portions of the ROD, RMP, and Final EIS that the Court found deficient in its previous order (Doc. 43 ). Within 60 days of this order, BLM shall implement the interim measures that Ronald Tipton proposed in his affidavit (Doc. 55-1). These measures shall include prohibiting recreational target shooting within the area identified in the affidavit and the accompanying map (Doc. 55-2). The Clerk shall enter a final judgment in this case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/17/15. (SJF)
June 9, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/9/2015.(DGC, nvo)
March 27, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment as to their claims that Defendants violated FLPMA and NEPA; and granting 35 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' claims that Defendants violated the AP A standing alone. The Court vacates the portions of the ROD, RMP, and Final EIS that permit recreational target shooting throughout the Monument and remands to BLM for reconsideration of that decision in light of the shortcomings identified in th is order. The Court also requires BLM to ensure that the Final EIS's analysis of mitigation measures and cumulative impacts be consistent with this order. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/27/15.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Trust for Historic Preservation et al v. Suazo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Suazo
Represented By: Clare Boronow
Represented By: Rachel Kathleen Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Clare Boronow
Represented By: Rachel Kathleen Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Clare Boronow
Represented By: Rachel Kathleen Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Trust for Historic Preservation
Represented By: Matthew K Bishop(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John R Mellgren(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Society
Represented By: Matthew K Bishop(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John R Mellgren(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archaeology Southwest
Represented By: Matthew K Bishop(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John R Mellgren(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?