Schad v. Brewer et al

Plaintiff: Edward Harold Schad, Jr.
Defendant: Janice K Brewer, Charles L Ryan, Ron Credio and Lance Hetmer
Intervenor_plaintiff: Robert Glen Jones, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2013cv02001
Filed: October 2, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the Motion to Intervene 30 is denied; Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis 2 is denied as moot; the Clerk shall terminate this matter as moot and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/25/13.(REW)
October 7, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion re 23 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 10/7/2013. (ROS, kb)
October 4, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion for TRO. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O. Silver on 10/4/2013.(ROS, kb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schad v. Brewer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice K Brewer
Represented By: Jon George Anderson
Represented By: Matthew H Binford
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Jon George Anderson
Represented By: Matthew H Binford
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Credio
Represented By: Jon George Anderson
Represented By: Matthew H Binford
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Hetmer
Represented By: Jon George Anderson
Represented By: Matthew H Binford
Represented By: John Pressley Todd
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Zick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Harold Schad, Jr.
Represented By: Kelley J Henry
Represented By: Denise I Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Robert Glen Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Represented By: Robin C Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?