Pipeline Technologies Incorporated v. Telog Instruments Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Pipeline Technologies Incorporated
Defendant: Telog Instruments Incorporated and Applied Products Group LLC
Counter_claimant: Telog Instruments Incorporated
Counter_defendant: Pipeline Technologies Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2013cv02104
Filed: October 16, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the claim against Defendant Applied Products Group, LLC is severed and stayed pending further order of the Court. Plaintiff and Defendant Applied Products Group, LLC shall file a report no later than November 15, 2014, addressing wheth er the action against Defendant Applied Products Group, LLC is suitable for referral for a settlement conference. The Clerk of Court shall transfer this action as to Defendant Telog Instruments Incorporated to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Plaintiff's 90 , 91 Motions to Preclude are denied without prejudice. The Hearing scheduled for October 30, 2014 is vacated. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/15/2014. (LFIG)
June 5, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and for Permission to Exceed Page Limit; denying 65 Motion for Permission to Exceed Page Limit: The deadline for the parties to file a joint claim construction and prehearing statement and to file their respective claim construction briefs is extended to 6/13/2014. The parties' page limitation for their claim construction briefs is extended to 25 pages. See order for additional details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/5/2014.(LMR)
June 3, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Defendants' Motion to Amend. Defendants are ordered to file and serve the amended pleadings on Plaintiff no later than June 20, 2014. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/3/2014.(ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pipeline Technologies Incorporated v. Telog Instruments Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telog Instruments Incorporated
Represented By: Marvin A Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Products Group LLC
Represented By: Marvin A Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipeline Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Blake H Frye(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Melissa Anne Emmel(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Paul Allen Conant(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jennifer Calvert(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Julie Burke(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Telog Instruments Incorporated
Represented By: Marvin A Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Pipeline Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Julie Burke(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jennifer Calvert(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Paul Allen Conant(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Melissa Anne Emmel(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Blake H Frye(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?