Miel v. Maricopa County Sheriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Terry Lee Miel
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office and Maricopa County Towers Jail
Case Number: 2:2013cv02125
Filed: October 18, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet): Counts Two and Three and the allegations in Count One unrelated to Plaintiff's food claims are dismissed without prejudice; Defendants John Doe, John Doe #2 and John Doe #3 are dismissed without prejudice; Defendant Ar paio must answer the food-related allegations in Count One; The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Second Amended Complaint 10 , this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Arpaio; Plainti ff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order; If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Second Amended C omplaint on a Defendant within 120 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to each Defendant not served; This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/1/2014. (See Order for details)(ALS)
April 9, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The First Amended Complaint 7 is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order; If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g); The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/3/2014. (ALS)
March 7, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Payment of Remaining Balance of Inmate Filing Fee Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Terry Miel. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/6/2014. (See attached PDF for complete information)(ALS)
December 30, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Terry Miel. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/27/2013. (See attached PDF for complete information)(ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miel v. Maricopa County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Lee Miel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Towers Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?