Christopher v. RJM Acquisitions LLC

Plaintiff: Jennifer Christopher
Defendant: RJM Acquisitions LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv02274
Filed: November 7, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mark E Aspey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that LBBS's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant RJM Acquisitions, LLC without Immediate Substitution, (Doc. 63 ), is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall refer this matter by random draw to a Unite d States Magistrate Judge to resolve Plaintiff's Motion for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor RJM Acquisitions, LLC, (Doc. 68 ), which remains pending. LATER - Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett is drawn by random lot. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/13/16. (KGM)
June 30, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is entitled to Attorney's Fees in the amount of $15,333.00. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/30/2015.(TLB)
February 3, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 31 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to enter judgment in favor of Defendant on Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint. ORDERED Plaintiff's 40 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Clerk is ordered to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff in the amount of $1,000 on Count II. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/3/2015.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopher v. RJM Acquisitions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJM Acquisitions LLC
Represented By: Michael Patrick Obert, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Stephen H Turner(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Christopher
Represented By: Russell Snow Thompson, IV(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?