Vianez v. United States District Court of Arizona

Plaintiff: Juan Alexander Vianez
Defendant: United States District Court of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2013cv02310
Filed: November 12, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Bridget S Bade (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's 12/23/13 Document 8 is denied; this action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to comply with a Court order; the Clerk must enter judgment accordingly and close this case; other than a document submitted in furtherance of an appeal, the Clerk shall accept no further documents for filing in this case number. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/13/14, nunc pro tunc. (REW)
December 12, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's November 25, 2013 Document 4 is denied; Plaintiff's December 2, 2013 Document 6 is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 12/12/13.(REW)
November 18, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plai ntiff fails to either pay or file a complete Application within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Plaintiff's Complaint 1 is dismissed w ithout prejudice for failure to file on a court-approved form. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 da ys, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Non-Habeas) and a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/18/2013. (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vianez v. United States District Court of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Alexander Vianez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?