Haney v. ACE American Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Jane Haney
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Incorporated, Lori Hasty and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2013cv02429
Filed: November 26, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 102 Motion for Summary Judgment. A final pretrial conference will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/16/2015.(DGC, nvo)
January 5, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/5/2015.(DGC, nvo)
March 25, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/25/2014.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haney v. ACE American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Haney
Represented By: Patrick Mason Dennis
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle
Represented By: Kevin B Wein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph G Adams
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Hasty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?