Thompson v. Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company et al

Plaintiff: William U Thompson
Defendant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company and Unknown Parties
Counter_claimant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Counter_defendant: William U Thompson
Case Number: 2:2013cv02437
Filed: November 27, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Hartford's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 53 ) with respect to Plaintiff's claim for breach of contract is GRANTED. Hartford's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 53 ) with respect to Plaintiff's claim for unjust enrichment is GRANTED. Hartford's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 53 ) with respect to Hartford's counterclaim of fraud against Plaintiff is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/16/15.(KGM)
March 30, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Hartford's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED dismissing with prejudice Plaintiff's claim against Hartford for the breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/30/2015.(TLB)
December 10, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Notice of Removal failing to sufficiently plead jurisdiction, IT IS ORDERED that by December 23, 2013, Defendant shall file an amended noticeof removal properly alleging federal subject matter jurisdiction, or this case will be remanded for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/9/13. (TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William U Thompson
Represented By: Thomas Hadley Leavell(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kristina Novotny Holmstrom(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kathleen Kelly Kahn(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kristina Novotny Holmstrom(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kathleen Kelly Kahn(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: William U Thompson
Represented By: Thomas Hadley Leavell(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?