Beamon v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: William Beamon
Defendant: Unknown Matthews, Unknown Smith-Witson, Arizona Department of Corrections and Unknown Fernadez
Case Number: 2:2013cv02570
Filed: December 17, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Defendants Fernandez, Smith-Whitson, and Ryan are dismissed without prejudice; Count Two of the Second Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice; Defendant Matthews must answer Count One; Plaintiff's Motion for Ap pointment of Counsel 11 is denied without prejudice; the Clerk must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Second Amended Complaint 12 , this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Matthews; Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk within 21 days; this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/28/14. (REW)
July 30, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the First Amended Complaint 8 is dismissed for failure to state a claim; Plaintiff has 30 days to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order; f Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/29/14. (REW)
April 22, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of William Beamon. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/17/2014. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beamon v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Smith-Witson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Fernadez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Beamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?