Eichenberger v. Falcon Air Express Incorporated

Plaintiff: Lori Eichenberger
Defendant: Falcon Air Express Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2014cv00168
Filed: January 29, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT: Default judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Lori Eichenberger and against Defendant Falcon Air for $162,663.94. Prejudgment interest at the rate set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1961 is awarded on the $4 3,831.97 backpay award and $43,831.97 liquidated damages award from March 1, 2012. Postjudgment interest is awarded on the total amount of damages in accord with 28 U.S.C. § 1961. Plaintiff's request for attorneys fees and costs is granted in the amount of $15,605 with interest accruing from the date of default judgment in accord with 28 U.S.C. §1961. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action and enter default judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/30/15. (KGM)
June 11, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. The Court will enter default judgment by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/11/2015.(DGC, nvo)
February 9, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Defense counsel's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant. The Court will enter default judgment against Defendant. Plaintiff shall, by February 20, 2015, submit a proposed form of judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/15. (LSP)
August 4, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims. Plaintiff's sixth, seventh, and ninth causes of action are dismissed. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/4/2014.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eichenberger v. Falcon Air Express Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Eichenberger
Represented By: Isaac Pasaret Hernandez(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Air Express Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?