Inter123 Corporation v. Ghaith

Plaintiff: Inter123 Corporation
Defendant: Chadi Ghaith
Case Number: 2:2014cv00463
Filed: March 7, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 41 Motion for Ruling. Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint on or before 6/3/2014. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/28/2014.(DGC, nvo)
May 5, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory; denying 36 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/5/2014.(DGC, nvo)
April 4, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; finding as moot 18 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 20 Motion to Vacate; finding as moot 25 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/4/2013.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inter123 Corporation v. Ghaith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inter123 Corporation
Represented By: Lance Christopher Venable
Represented By: Wendy Kemp Akbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chadi Ghaith
Represented By: David D Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?