Weller v. Richardson et al

Plaintiff: Jeffery R Weller
Defendant: Nicholas DiPiazza, Glendale, City of, Glendale City Attorney's Office, Denver Wells, Sam Richardson and Christina A Parry
Case Number: 2:2014cv00832
Filed: April 18, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pima
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's "Motion that the Court Order Plaintiff's Civil Filing be Ordered as Criminal Allegations" (Doc. 10 ) is denied. Plaintiff shall have an additional 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amende d complaint in compliance with the Court's June 26, 2014 Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days of this Order, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/31/2014. (KMG)
June 26, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Jeffery Weller. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/26/2014. (LFIG)
April 30, 2014 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $400.00 filing and administrative fees or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk must enter dismissal without prejudice if plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/28/14. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weller v. Richardson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas DiPiazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendale, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glendale City Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina A Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery R Weller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?