Pangerl v. Peoria Unified School District

Plaintiff: Regina Pangerl
Defendant: Peoria Unified School District
Case Number: 2:2014cv00836
Filed: April 21, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2017 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: denying Plaintiff's claims 72 pertaining to Count 1 of the First Amended Complaint 40 and affirming the 3/18/14 decision of the Administrative Law Judge; Plaintiff shall either provide a brief by 3/1/17, justifying the use of the initials T.P. as identification for her daughter in this lawsuit, or use her daughter's real name in all further filings; if Plaintiff files a brief, Defendant may file a response brief by 3/10/17. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/15/17. (REW)
January 29, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Plaintiff Regina Pangerl's Motion in Limine as to the Administrative Record. ORDERED granting in part and denying in part 44 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. The District shall supplement t he Administrative Record with Exhibits S52 and S80 by March 4, 2016. Plaintiff, at her discretion and expense, may provide certified transcripts of these Exhibits to the Court and the District by March 18, 2016. ORDERED that pursuant to the Court& #039;s August 20, 2015 Order (Doc. 53 ), the parties shall file simultaneous Opening Briefs on the merits of Plaintiff's first cause of action, namely the appeal of the administrative decision under IDEA, by April 1, 2016. ORDERED denying 59 District's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum. FURTHER ORDERED denying 62 Plaintiff's Request for Status of these Motions as moot. See document for details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/29/16. (EJA)
December 14, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court *ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Portions of Answer and/or to Compel Amended Answer (Doc. 52 ). Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery (Doc. 54 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part Defendant&# 039;s Motion for Protective Order and Fees (Doc. 56 ). Defendant is not required to answer Plaintiff's pending discovery requests, and the parties shall not propound further discovery, until the Court sets a discovery schedule on Plaintiff's new claims, if necessary. The Court denies both parties' requests for attorneys' fees associated with these Motions. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 12/14/15.(KGM) *Modified to add link to document number on 12/14/2015 (KGM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pangerl v. Peoria Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Pangerl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peoria Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?