McNair v. Maxwell & Morgan PC et al

Plaintiff: Martha A McNair
Defendant: Maxwell & Morgan PC, Charles E Maxwell, Unknown Maxwell, W William Nikolaus and Unknown Nikolaus
Case Number: 2:2014cv00869
Filed: April 24, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Bridget S Bade
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. 80 ) is denied. Defendants' cross motion for summary judgment (Doc. 100 ) is granted. Plaintiff's motions in limine (Docs. 82 , 83 ) are denied as moot. Plaintif f's motion to strike Defendants' supplemental expert report (Doc. 85 ) is granted for reasons stated on the record at oral argument. Defendants' motion to strike (Doc. 99 ) is denied. Clerk to enter judgment for Defendants and terminate the action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/4/15. (EJA)
September 22, 2015 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 99 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/22/2015.(DGC, nvo)
January 28, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting 57 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall file her First Amended Complaint on or before 2/2/2015. All Defendants shall be served on or before 2/27/2015. The Court will not grant further extension to these deadlines. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/28/2015.(DGC, nvo)
September 5, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/5/2014.(DGC, nvo)
August 26, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and granting 16 Defendant's Motion to Strike 14 Friend of Court Notice. Mr. Ticktin is barred from submitting any further filings in this proceeding. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/14.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNair v. Maxwell & Morgan PC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha A McNair
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Represented By: Rachel W Maron
Represented By: Douglas Clark Wigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxwell & Morgan PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W William Nikolaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nikolaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?