Maguire v. Coltrell et al

Plaintiff: Robert D Maguire
Defendant: Cathleen A Coltrell and John Carmichael
Counter_claimant: Cathleen A Coltrell and John Carmichael
Counter_defendant: Robert D Maguire
Case Number: 2:2014cv01255
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Robert Maguire has failed to prove his claims against Cathleen Coltrell. Cathleen Coltrell has failed to prove her claims against Robert Maguire. The Clerk shall enter judgment and terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/20/15. (LSP)
September 29, 2015 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. The parties shall agree upon a convenient time for the deposition before trial. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/29/2015.(DGC, nvo)
July 1, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) and granting 64 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Defendant Carmichael is awarded attorneys' fees and costs of $18,639.88. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/1/15.(SJF)
April 30, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/30/2015.(DGC, nvo)
February 4, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims; denying 40 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/4/2015.(DGC, nvo)
November 10, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint on or before November 21, 2014. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/10/2014.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maguire v. Coltrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathleen A Coltrell
Represented By: J Phillip Glasscock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carmichael
Represented By: J Phillip Glasscock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D Maguire
Represented By: David H Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Cathleen A Coltrell
Represented By: J Phillip Glasscock
Represented By: J Phillip Glasscock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: John Carmichael
Represented By: J Phillip Glasscock
Represented By: J Phillip Glasscock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Robert D Maguire
Represented By: David H Carmichael
Represented By: David H Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?