Puente Arizona et al v. Arpaio et al

Plaintiff: Puente Arizona, Susan E Frederick-Gray, Sara Cervantes Arreola and Guadalupe Arredondo
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio, Bill Montgomery, Robert Halliday and Maricopa, County of
Case Number: 2:2014cv01356
Filed: June 18, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2017 701 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiffs' request for declaratory relief is granted. Plaintiffs' request for a permanent injunction against Maricopa County Sheriff Paul Penzone is granted. Defendant Penzone shall create a written policy for MCSO consistent wi th this permanent injunction and disseminate it within MCSO within 60 days of this order. Plaintiffs' request for injunctive relief against Defendants Montgomery and Maricopa County, and for expungement of the convictions of Plaintiffs Cervant es Arreola and Estrada Fernandez, are denied. Defendants' motion to file a non-electronic supplement (Doc. 688 ) is denied, and Plaintiffs' motion to strike (Doc. 689 ) is granted. The Clerk shall enter final judgment in accordance with this order. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/24/17. (LAD)
November 22, 2016 623 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 538 ) is granted with respect to preemption of Defendants' use of the Form I-9 and attached documents, and otherwise denied. 2. Defendant State of Arizona's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 510 ) is denied with respect to preemption of Defendants' use of the Form I-9 and attached documents, granted with respect to Plaintiffs' other preemption claims, and granted with respect to Plaintiffs' equal protecti on claims. 3. Defendant Montgomery's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 534 ) is denied with respect to preemption of Defendants use of the Form I-9 and attached documents, granted with respect to Plaintiffs' other preemption claims, and granted with respect to Plaintiffs' equal protection claims. 4. Defendant Arpaio's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 525 ) is denied with respect to preemption of Defendants use of the Form I-9 and attached documents, granted with respect to Plaintiffs' other preemption claims, and granted with respect to Plaintiffs' equal protection claims. 5. Defendant Maricopa Countys motion for summary judgment on Monell liability (Doc. 511 ) is denied with respect to Defendant Arpaio and granted with respect to Defendant Montgomery. 6. The motion for leave to file excess pages (Docs. 543 ) is granted. 7. Plaintiffs shall file a memorandum on the appropriate remedy in this case, not to exceed 15 pages, on or before December 7, 2016. Defendants shall file a joint reply, not to exceed 15 pages, on or before December 21, 2016. Plaintiffs shall file a 7 page reply on or before January 4, 2017. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/22/16. (LAD)
August 9, 2016 563 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 529 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/9/2016.(DGC, nvo)
May 5, 2016 479 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 442 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/5/2016.(DGC, nvo)
February 24, 2016 440 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 409 Motion for Reconsideration. Defendants may ask which family members were supported as alleged in paragraphs 11 and 12 of the Second Amended Complaint, but may not inquire into the immigration status of the Expungement Plaintiffs family members or other efforts of the Expungement Plaintiffs to obtain work.Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/24/2016.(TCA)
February 19, 2016 431 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re discovery conference call of 1/20/2016. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/19/2016. (DGC, nvo)
March 27, 2015 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 141 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 141 Motion reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/27/2015.(DGC, nvo)
January 5, 2015 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction (Doc. 30 ) is granted. Until further order of the Court, Defendants are enjoined from enforcing A.R.S. § 2009(A)(3) and the portion of A.R.S. § 13-2008(A) that addresses acti ons committed "with the intent to obtain or continue employment." 2. Defendants' motions to dismiss and strike (Docs. 53 , 55 , 127 ) are denied. 3. Parties' motions to supplement (Docs. 84 , 98 , 103 , 123 ) are granted. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/5/15. (LAD)
December 1, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: December 10, 2014, Plaintiffs shall file a memorandum, not to exceed 10pages, which attaches one or more anonymous affidavits and addresses why they show standing in this case. December 17, 2014, Defendants shall file a joint memorandum, not to exceed ten pages, addressing Plaintiffs December 10th filing. No further memoranda will be filed without order of the Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/1/2014. (TCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puente Arizona et al v. Arpaio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puente Arizona
Represented By: Sameer M. Ashar
Represented By: Jessica Devlin Karp
Represented By: Anne Lai
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Ray Anthony Ybarra Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan E Frederick-Gray
Represented By: Sameer M. Ashar
Represented By: Jessica Devlin Karp
Represented By: Anne Lai
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Ray Anthony Ybarra Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Cervantes Arreola
Represented By: Sameer M. Ashar
Represented By: Jessica Devlin Karp
Represented By: Anne Lai
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Ray Anthony Ybarra Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Arredondo
Represented By: Sameer M. Ashar
Represented By: Jessica Devlin Karp
Represented By: Anne Lai
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Ray Anthony Ybarra Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Represented By: Michele Marie Iafrate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Montgomery
Represented By: Douglas L Irish
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: J Kenneth Mangum
Represented By: Ann Thompson Uglietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Halliday
Represented By: G Michael Tryon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Represented By: Michele Marie Iafrate
Represented By: Douglas L Irish
Represented By: Thomas P Liddy
Represented By: J Kenneth Mangum
Represented By: Ann Thompson Uglietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?