Zaldivar #166954 v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al

Plaintiff: Jose Adalberto Zaldivar, Sr.
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Unknown Party and Pima, County of
Case Number: 2:2014cv01493
Filed: July 1, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 49 ). Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 49) is granted, and this action is terminated with prejudice. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/22/2016.(KMG)
October 27, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Defendant OIG's 20 Motion to Dismiss is granted and OIG isdismissed from this action. Defendants VARO and OGC's 21 Partial Motion to Dismiss is granted. Plaintiff's claims regarding the FOIA requests he submitted on October 20, 2002, April 13, 2005 and July 10, 2007 are dismissed. The remaining claims in this action are against VARO and OGC relating to Plaintiff's April 26, 2012 FOIA request in Count One and Plaintiff's May 20, 2013 FOIA request in Count Two. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/27/15. (ATD)
December 24, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 2 ) is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an ini tial partial filing fee of $35.83. The Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. 4 .) is denied without prejudice. The Motion for Clarification and Status of the Case (Doc. 8 ) is granted insofar as this Order informs Plaintiff of the status of this cas e. Count Three is dismissed. Defendant Pima County is dismissed. Defendants Veterans Affairs Regional Office-Phoenix, Veterans Affairs Office of General Counsel, and Veterans Affairs Office of the Inspector General must answer Counts One and Two of t he Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. 1 ), this Order, and summons forms for Defendants Veterans Affairs Regional Office-Phoenix, Veterans Affairs Office of General Counsel, Veterans Affa irs Office of the Inspector General, and the United States of America. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/24/2014. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaldivar #166954 v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Adalberto Zaldivar, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pima, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?