Lassley v. Secura Supreme Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Brandon AW Lassley
Defendant: Secura Supreme Insurance Company and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2014cv01677
Filed: July 25, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 25, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Secura is HEREBY ORDERED to pay Lassley $14,095. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 11/25/15.(JWS)
September 25, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION denying 24 Defendant Secura Supreme Insurance Company's Motion to Bifurcate and denying 24 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 9/25/15.(EJA)
August 18, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Protective Order; denying 29 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 8/18/2015. Lassley shall file a motion for attorneys' fees within 14 days. It must be supported as required by the local rules. Secura shall respond within 14 days after the motion is filed. The response may contest the amount sought, but not Lassley's right to recover a reasonable amount. No reply may be filed unless requested by the court.(JWS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lassley v. Secura Supreme Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secura Supreme Insurance Company
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Kassmann(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon AW Lassley
Represented By: Justin Dean Holm(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher Scott Welker(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Matthew William Wright(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?