Ericson et al v. Phoenix, City of et al

Plaintiff: Yolanda Ericson and Canon Ruiz
Defendant: Phoenix, City of, Daniel Garcia, Mike Wesley, Justin Schmidt, Robert Mathews, Abraham Camarillo, Kevin Linn, Christopher Leubkin and Stan Hoover
Case Number: 2:2014cv01942
Filed: September 4, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2016 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that City Defendants' Motion to Exclude (Doc. 94 ) is DENIED. Defendant Camarillo's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 98 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, consistent with the reasoning above. Defendant Camarillo is entitled t o summary judgment on Counts II, III, and IV. Summary judgment for Defendant Camarillo is denied on Count V. City Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 106 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Garcia is entitled to summary judgment on Counts II, III, and V. Defendant City of Phoenix is entitled to summary judgment on Counts III and VI. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/2/16.(KGM)
March 17, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion in limine to preclude all witnesses and evidence disclosed for the first time in Defendants' Eighth Supplemental Disclosure Statement (served on Plaintiffs one business day before the close of discovery) (Doc. 86 ) is granted. [See attached Order for complete details.] Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/17/2016. (KAL) Modified on 3/18/2016 to WO(SJF).
December 19, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Negligence Claim (Doc. 11 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/19/2014.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ericson et al v. Phoenix, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Represented By: Christina Gail Retts
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Garcia
Represented By: Christina Gail Retts
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Wesley
Represented By: Christina Gail Retts
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Schmidt
Represented By: Christina Gail Retts
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Mathews
Represented By: Christina Gail Retts
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Camarillo
Represented By: John T Masterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Linn
Represented By: Christina Gail Retts
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Leubkin
Represented By: Christina Gail Retts
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Hoover
Represented By: Christina Gail Retts
Represented By: Kathleen L Wieneke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Ericson
Represented By: Jocquese Lamount Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canon Ruiz
Represented By: Jocquese Lamount Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?