Kimm v. Brannan et al
Plaintiff: Jack Kimm
Defendant: Martin Brannan, Rayburn Evans, Samuel Verderman, Frank Haws, Thomas Jones and La Paz, County of
Case Number: 2:2014cv01966
Filed: September 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 144 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment in favor of Martin Brannan, Samuel Verderman, Thomas Jones, Frank Haws, and La Paz County is granted on all remaining counts. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 10/25/17.(JWS)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER AND OPINION: Evans's Motion for Summary Judgment at docket 112 is GRANTED. Judgment in favor of Evans is granted on all counts against him. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 8/16/2017. (REK)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline; denying 97 Motion to Strike; denying 98 Motion to Strike; den ying 103 Motion to Compel. The fact discovery deadline is extended to April 21, 2017, solely for conducting the depositions of Haws, Suskin, and Churchill. No other discovery may be conducted. The dispositive motions and motions in limine deadline is extended to June 23, 2017. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 3/27/17.(JWS)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER AND OPINION: granting 39 Motion to Amend; granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Dismiss. See document for further details. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 10/8/15. (EJA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimm v. Brannan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Kimm
Represented By: Joy Malby Bertrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Brannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayburn Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Verderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Haws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Paz, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?