Rosciano v. Experian et al

Plaintiff: Jose Rosciano
Defendant: Experian, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated, Midland Funding, Midland Credit Management Incorporated and T-Mobile USA Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2014cv02102
Filed: September 23, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order of Dismissal, etc., (Doc. 52 ) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the order of 04/01/15 (Doc. 50 ), is vacated. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 5/1/15. (NKS)
April 1, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Midland's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Doc. 47 ) is granted. The Clerk shall terminate this case as against Defendant Midland. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 4/1/15. (NKS)
January 13, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Midland's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) (Doc. 23 ) is granted with leave to amend by 01/30/15. If by that date Plaintiff has not filed an amended complaint, Defendant Midland's motion will be granted with prejudice. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 1/13/15. (NKS)
December 22, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Claims (Doc. 13 ) is granted. This action will be stayed until Plaintiff has exhausted his arbitration remedy. If Plaintiff does not commence arbitration proceedings by 02/20/15, this action will be dismissed as against Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 12/19/14. (NKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosciano v. Experian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rosciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding
Represented By: Randy Jiro Aoyama(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael Ronald Ayers
Represented By: Bradley Lynn Dunn(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management Incorporated
Represented By: Randy Jiro Aoyama(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael Ronald Ayers
Represented By: Bradley Lynn Dunn(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?