Garcia v. Salvation Army

Plaintiff: Ann Garcia
Defendant: Salvation Army
Case Number: 2:2014cv02225
Filed: October 7, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mark E Aspey
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2016 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Salvation Army's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 147 ) is granted;Garcia's motions for summary judgment (Docs. 150 , 151 ) are denied;Salvation Army's motion to strike portions of Plaintiff's reply (Doc. 170 ) is denied as moot; The Clerk is directed to enter judgment according to this order and terminate these actions. See document for further details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/12/2016. (REK)
February 2, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The motions to amend (Doc. 73 , 76 ) are denied. Further amendments will not be permitted. This case shall proceed on the basis of existing pleadings and the schedule set forth in Case Management Order #2 (Doc. 72 ). Defendant's motion to strike (Doc. 81 ) is denied as unnecessary and therefore moot. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/02/2016. (REK)
October 23, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for limited scope representation by attorney (Doc. 66 ) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/23/2015. (REK)
September 25, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 61 : Plaintiff's motion to amend (Doc. 46 ) is denied. Defendant's motion to transfer and consolidate (Doc. 44 ) is granted. Case No. CV15-01444-PHX-SPL will be transferred to the undersigned and consolidated with this case. The parties shall, on or before October 16, 2015, submit a proposed revised case management order for the consolidated case. The parties shall file all future pleadings in the lead case, CV14-2225 PHX DGC, only. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 09/25/2015. (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Salvation Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvation Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?