Cosgrove v. National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: |
Karen Cosgrove |
Defendant: |
National Fire & Marine Insurance Company |
Counter_claimant: |
National Fire & Marine Insurance Company |
Counter_defendant: |
Karen Cosgrove |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv02229 |
Filed: |
October 8, 2014 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Phoenix Division Office |
County: |
Maricopa |
Presiding Judge: |
H Russel Holland |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 21, 2019 |
Filing
199
ORDER - United Policyholders' motion to unseal 194 is granted. The minute entry at Docket No. 170 and the court's written decision at Docket No. 171 shall be unsealed. The court's rulings in the minute entry at Docket No. 170 remain vacated as does the court's written decision at Docket No. 171 . (See document for complete details). Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 8/20/19. (SLQ)
|
June 20, 2019 |
Filing
193
ORDER - The court grants United Policyholders' Motion to Intervene (Doc. 177 ) to file a Motion to Unseal the orders at Docket Nos. 170 and 171 . Should United Policyholders decide to file a Motion to Unseal, that motion shall be filed on or before 7/3/2019. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 6/19/19. (DXD)
|
January 18, 2018 |
Filing
184
ORDER - United Policyholders' Motion to Intervene was untimely. Allowing United Policyholders to intervene in this case, which has been dismissed pursuant to a settlement by the parties, would be prejudicial to the parties. Thus, United Policyholders' Motion to Intervene (Doc. 177 ) is denied. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 1/18/18. (DXD)
|
April 10, 2017 |
Filing
171
ORDER PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS - Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment 147 was granted as to the Subcontractors Exclusion. But, to the extent that plaintiff has moved to estop defendant from asserting any other coverage defe nses, her motion is denied. The information that was improperly disclosed to defendant only pertained to the Subcontractors Exclusion. Defendant is only estopped from asserting a coverage defense based on the Subcontractors Exclusion. Because plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment was granted, defendant's motion for partial summary judgment 160 was deemed moot. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 4/10/17. (SLQ)
|
November 9, 2016 |
Filing
148
ORDER granting 135 Motion for Reasonable Expenses. Plaintiff is awarded $5,953.50 in attorney's fees. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 11/8/16. (LAD)
|
September 2, 2016 |
Filing
132
ORDER denying 127 Plaintiff's Motion for a Hearing and granting 121 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Defendant shall produce its communications with the Graif firm to the extent those communications occurred prior to September 17, 2013 and addressed the coverage issues in the underlying case on which defendant based its settlement decisions. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 9/2/16.(LSP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?