Airbus DS Optronics GmbH v. Nivisys LLC et al

Plaintiff: Airbus DS Optronics GmbH
Defendant: Nivisys LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2014cv02399
Filed: October 28, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2016 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's discovery motions (Docs. 223 and 225 ) are denied. See attached Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/21/2016. (KAL)
May 3, 2016 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' motion to dismiss Count III of the SAC, (Doc. 117 ; Doc. 119 ; Doc. 127 ), is DENIED. Defendants' motion to dismiss Count IV of the SAC, (Doc. 117 ; Doc. 119 ; Doc. 127 ), is GRANTED. First Texas' motion to di smiss Count II of the SAC, (Doc. 127 ), is DENIED. Plaintiff's request for leave to amend the SAC, (Doc. 131 at 1; Doc. 132 at 1; Doc. 154 at 1), is DENIED. Defendants' request for attorneys' fees pursuant to A.R.S. § 12-341.01, (Doc. 117 ; Doc. 119 ; Doc. 127 ), is DENIED, without prejudice. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/2/2016. (KAL)
September 17, 2015 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 100 Stipulation re: Subpoena. See attached Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/17/2015. (TLB)
May 28, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - denying 45 WWWT's Motion to Transfer Venue. FURTHER ORDERED denying 41 WWWT's Motion to Dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED granting 70 Airbus' Motion to Strike. FURTHER ORDERED striking Doc. 56. FURTHER ORDERED granting 76 Airb us' Motion to Strike. FURTHER ORDERED striking Doc. 65. FURTHER ORDERED granting 40 Motion to Quash Subpeona Duces Tecum and Notice of Duces Tecum Deposition Served on Tiffany & Bosco and Attorney Jim O'Sullivan. FURTHER ORDERED quash ing the subpoena attached as Exhibit A to Doc. 40. FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice 63 First Texas' Motion to Quash Subpoena. FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice 49 Airbus' Motion to Compel First Texas' Compliance with Subpoena. FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice 78 First Texas' Motion for a Protective Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/28/2015.(TLB)
January 29, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 19 Parties' second Stipulation for entry of a protective order. The parties' may file a third stipulation in which the proposed form of order is consistent with the parties' articulated basis for requiring a protective order. (See attached Order). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 1/29/2015. (TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Airbus DS Optronics GmbH v. Nivisys LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airbus DS Optronics GmbH
Represented By: William Francis Auther
Represented By: Corey Israel Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nivisys LLC
Represented By: Scott A Klundt
Represented By: Amy Dody Sells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?