Wake Up and Ball LLC v. Sony Music Entertainment Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Wake Up and Ball LLC
Defendant: Sony Music Entertainment Incorporated and Deepfreeze Entertainment LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv02403
Filed: October 28, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim nd Improper Venue filed by Sony Music Entertainment Incorporated. 35 denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/2/2015. (DGC, nvo)
September 30, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 101 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record (Charlene Tarver). Eric P. O'Connor of OConnor, PC, 1055 W. 7th Street, Suite 3300, Los Angeles, CA 90017 is substituted as counsel of record for Defendants Deepfreeze Entertainment, LLC and Robert Carr. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/30/15. (LAD)
August 13, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 51 Motion to Dismiss. Parties may conduct jurisdictional discovery between now and October 2, 2015. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/13/2015.(TCA)
April 16, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion to Dismiss Party; denying 27 Motion for Attorney Fees. The deadline for serving Defendants Deepfreeze Entertainment LLC and Robert Carr is extended to 5/15/2015. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/16/2015.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wake Up and Ball LLC v. Sony Music Entertainment Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wake Up and Ball LLC
Represented By: Connie Jo Mableson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Lance Christopher Venable(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Music Entertainment Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepfreeze Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?