Johnson v. Federal Express Corporation

Plaintiff: Paul Johnson
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Case Number: 2:2014cv02428
Filed: October 31, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2016 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 172 Motion re denial of costs. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/19/2016.(DGC, nvo)
August 24, 2016 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 116 Motion in Limine; denying 117 Motion in Limine; denying 118 Motion in Limine; granting 119 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion in Limine; denying 121 Motion in Limine; denying 122 Motion in Limine; granting 123 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/24/2016.(DGC, nvo)
April 21, 2016 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 99 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court will hold a telephonic hearing on 5/11/2016 at 4:30 p.m. to set a firm trial date. Counsel shall have knowled ge of their client and witnesses availability at the time of the telephonic hearing. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call or set up a dial-in number and notify all parties of the dial-in information no later than 5/10/2016. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/21/2016.(DGC, nvo)
April 15, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot plaintiff's motion for leave to amend 20 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/2015.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Johnson
Represented By: Thomas Timothy Griffin(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?