Bultemeyer v. CenturyLink Incorporated
Plaintiff: Lydia Bultemeyer
Defendant: CenturyLink Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2014cv02530
Filed: November 14, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER denying without prejudice 281 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying as moot and without prejudice 297 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/6/25. (MJW)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER denying 269 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/28/25. (MJW)
January 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER denying 267 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 1/30/25. (MJW)
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER: Defendant CenturyLink's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 291 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 12/5/2024. (KJ)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct Clerk's Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(a) (Doc. 263 ) is granted. The Clerk shall amend the judgment (Doc. 251 ) to add the following language: "This judgment applie s to the 56,075 individuals to whom the Rule(c)(2) notice was directed, who fall under the certified class definition, none of whom has requested exclusion, and whom the Court finds to be members of the certified class in this matter." The Clerk shall amend the judgment (Doc. 251 ) at lines 17, 18, and 19 to state: "IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed September 16, 2024, judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendant in the amount of $500.00 for statutory damages per class member and $2,000.00 for punitive damages per class member." Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/15/2024. (KJ)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER: Plaintiff Lydia Bultemeyer's Renewed Motion for Class Certification 171 is granted. Pursuant to Rule 23(b)(3), the Court certifies a class defined as every individual in the United States about whom Defendant CenturyLink obtained a cons umer credit report using the personal information the individual entered into CenturyLink's ecommerce website from November 14, 2012 through November 14, 2014 and who did not sign an arbitration agreement or class action waiver with CenturyLink. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Law Offices of Andrew J. Brown and the Thompson Consumer Law Group are appointed as class counsel. Pursuant to the Court's January 8, 2021 Order 121 , a motion to approve a class notice shall be filed no later than March 6, 2023, or if this Order is appealed, no later than thirty (30) days from when the petition is denied or the Ninth Circuit issues an order. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 2/02/2023. (REK)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class (Doc. 138 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a renewed motion for class certification resolving the issues stated in the attached order no later than 4/28/2022. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/7/2022. (RMW)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 111 and Defendant's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 109 are denied. See order for details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 10/14/2020. (LMR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bultemeyer v. CenturyLink Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Bultemeyer
Represented By: David Neal McDevitt
Represented By: Russell Snow Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?