Baker v. Walgreens Company

Plaintiff: Karen M Baker
Defendant: Walgreens Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv00342
Filed: February 25, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, (Doc. 44 ), is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's motion for summary judgment, (Doc. 45 ), with respect to Plaintiff's state law claim is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant and dismiss this case with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/8/16. (KGM)
May 6, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Court will exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state-law claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367. The Court's Rule 16(b) 15 Scheduling Order, is hereby amended to establish a new deadline of Friday, May 20, 2016, for all dispositive motions to be filed. The Court's Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order, is hereby amended to grant the parties leave to file a second motion for summary judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 05/05/2016. (ATD)
April 18, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's motion for summary judgment on Plaintiff's Title VII and ADEA claims, (Doc. 34 ), is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file briefs as specified above on the issue of whether jurisdiction continues for the Court to hear Plaintiff's state-law claim no later than Monday, May 2, 2016. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/18/2016.(KMG)
January 12, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the motion for protective order (Doc. 31 ) is denied. See order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 1/11/16. (NKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Walgreens Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen M Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?